THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 22
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 477-5677
Fax: (905) 477-2277
Address: Skin Med Laser Clinic
Unit 5&6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Choy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choy (CPSO#: 68209 )
Business Address: 7010 Warden Avenue
Unit 22
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
(905) 477-5677

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 22
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 477-5677
Fax: (905) 477-2277
Address: Skin Med Laser Clinic
Unit 5&6
9019 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Choy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choy (CPSO#: 68209 )
Business Address: 7010 Warden Avenue
Unit 22
Markham Ontario L3R 5Y3
(905) 477-5677

Corporation Name: Choy & Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SZE HON CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SZE HON CHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994