THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:15:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Barrack Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1G2
Phone: 6135491440
Fax: 613.549.7986
Address: 2300 Princess St
Quarry Family Medicine
Foot/Wound Care
Kingston ON K7M 3G4
Phone: 613-541-3922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Waldron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Waldron (CPSO#: 68227 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Barrack Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1G2
Phone: 6135491440
Fax: 613.549.7986
Address: 2300 Princess St
Quarry Family Medicine
Foot/Wound Care
Kingston ON K7M 3G4
Phone: 613-541-3922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Waldron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Waldron (CPSO#: 68227 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ANDREW WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994