THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macdonald (CPSO#: 68234 )
Business Address: 11 - 2006 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
(613) 903-6006
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Dec 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macdonald (CPSO#: 68234 )
Business Address: 11 - 2006 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
(613) 903-6006
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994