THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Parkinson, Denise Lynne (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Parkinson, Denise Lynne (Used Until: 26 Sep 1999)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 16
235 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 397-7716
Fax: (905) 397-7028

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Campeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campeau (CPSO#: 68241 )
Business Address: 235 Martindale Road
Unit 16
Grimsby Ontario L2W 1A5
(905) 397-7716

General Information

Former Name: Parkinson, Denise Lynne (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Parkinson, Denise Lynne (Used Until: 26 Sep 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 16
235 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 397-7716
Fax: (905) 397-7028

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Campeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Campeau (CPSO#: 68241 )
Business Address: 235 Martindale Road
Unit 16
Grimsby Ontario L2W 1A5
(905) 397-7716

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LYNNE CAMPEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LYNNE CAMPEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994