THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:21:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 4N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2267215437
Fax: 5199371697

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudhir D' Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza (CPSO#: 68256 )
Business Address: 302 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 4N9
2267215437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Non-Binary
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 4N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2267215437
Fax: 5199371697

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudhir D' Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza (CPSO#: 68256 )
Business Address: 302 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 4N9
2267215437

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR JUDE ANTHONY D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR JUDE ANTHONY D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 May 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 May 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994