THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:34:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 GW 560
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4282
Fax: (416) 340-3281

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gollob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gollob (CPSO#: 68262 )
Business Address: 602 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2C4
(905) 953-7917
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Room 3 GW 360
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4282
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
416 883 3783

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 GW 560
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4282
Fax: (416) 340-3281

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Gollob Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gollob (CPSO#: 68262 )
Business Address: 602 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2C4
(905) 953-7917
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Room 3 GW 360
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4282
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
416 883 3783

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOWARD GOLLOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLLOB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOWARD GOLLOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLLOB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994