THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Law (CPSO#: 68275 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 2415

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Extension: 2415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Law (CPSO#: 68275 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
17th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 2415

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL FAI LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL FAI LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994