THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:15:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 27 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Prowse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Prowse (CPSO#: 68283 )
Business Address: Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 346-1440

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 27 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Prowse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Prowse (CPSO#: 68283 )
Business Address: Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 346-1440

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OWEN ALEXANDER PROWSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROWSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OWEN ALEXANDER PROWSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROWSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994