THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 01:52:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4V1
Business Email: lhowlett@brightshores.ca
Phone: 519-3762121
Extension: 2279
Fax: 519-372-3954
Address: 90 7th Ave
Diagnostic Imaging
First Floor
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 519-364-2340
Extension: 223
Fax: 519-364-6602
Address: Owen Sound Medical Imaging
1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 376-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson Howlett Hawkes Rosta Saab Baldauf Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt (CPSO#: 93758 ) Dr. L. Howlett (CPSO#: 68288 ) Dr. G. Saab (CPSO#: 81104 ) Dr. N. Rosta (CPSO#: 67897 ) Dr. R. Hawkes (CPSO#: 77933 ) Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 107263 ) Dr. C. McIver (CPSO#: 31778 ) Dr. S. Thomson (CPSO#: 57552 ) Dr. S. Drover (CPSO#: 82776 ) Dr. C. Baldauf (CPSO#: 72518 )
Business Address: 3006-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519 376 2000

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Howlett, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Howlett (CPSO#: 68288 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Medical Centre
3600 - 1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 376-2000
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4V1
Business Email: lhowlett@brightshores.ca
Phone: 519-3762121
Extension: 2279
Fax: 519-372-3954
Address: 90 7th Ave
Diagnostic Imaging
First Floor
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: 519-364-2340
Extension: 223
Fax: 519-364-6602
Address: Owen Sound Medical Imaging
1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 376-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson Howlett Hawkes Rosta Saab Baldauf Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt (CPSO#: 93758 ) Dr. L. Howlett (CPSO#: 68288 ) Dr. G. Saab (CPSO#: 81104 ) Dr. N. Rosta (CPSO#: 67897 ) Dr. R. Hawkes (CPSO#: 77933 ) Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 107263 ) Dr. C. McIver (CPSO#: 31778 ) Dr. S. Thomson (CPSO#: 57552 ) Dr. S. Drover (CPSO#: 82776 ) Dr. C. Baldauf (CPSO#: 72518 )
Business Address: 3006-1415 1st Ave W
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519 376 2000

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Howlett, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Howlett (CPSO#: 68288 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Medical Centre
3600 - 1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 376-2000
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE HOWLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWLETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE HOWLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWLETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994