THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hladunewich, Michelle (Used Until: 05 Dec 2002)
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CNIB - Kidney Care Centre
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-5755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HLADUNEWICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hladunewich (CPSO#: 68296 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room D474
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Corporation Name: Hladunewich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: Hladunewich, Michelle (Used Until: 05 Dec 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CNIB - Kidney Care Centre
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-5755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HLADUNEWICH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hladunewich (CPSO#: 68296 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Room D474
Toronto ON M4N 3M5

Corporation Name: Hladunewich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ADRIENNE HLADUNEWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLADUNEWICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ADRIENNE HLADUNEWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLADUNEWICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994