THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:08:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 191 McNaughton Road East
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-748-8434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2494 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K9
Phone: 416-691-5071
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JL Lapin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lapin (CPSO#: 68301 )
Business Address: 2630 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9V 4B9
(416) 748-8434
Business Address: B1 - 294 Main Street
Toronto Ontario M4C 4X5
(416) 691-5071

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 191 McNaughton Road East
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-748-8434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2494 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1K9
Phone: 416-691-5071
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JL Lapin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lapin (CPSO#: 68301 )
Business Address: 2630 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9V 4B9
(416) 748-8434
Business Address: B1 - 294 Main Street
Toronto Ontario M4C 4X5
(416) 691-5071

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN LOUIS LAPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN LOUIS LAPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994