THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:45:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Finch Ave W
311
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167422961
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 28 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Beder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beder (CPSO#: 68308 )
Business Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
suite 311
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Address: Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
(416) 742-2961
Business Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
605
North York ON M3J 0L5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1275 Finch Ave W
311
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167422961
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 28 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Beder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Beder (CPSO#: 68308 )
Business Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
suite 311
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Address: Suite 401
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
(416) 742-2961
Business Address: 1275 Finch Ave W
605
North York ON M3J 0L5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON LESLIE BEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON LESLIE BEDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994