THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-699-7775
Fax: 416-699-7766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Wintemute Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wintemute (CPSO#: 68309 )
Business Address: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
416-699-7775
Business Address: Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 223-0555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-699-7775
Fax: 416-699-7766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Wintemute Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wintemute (CPSO#: 68309 )
Business Address: 1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J3
416-699-7775
Business Address: Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 223-0555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOAN WINTEMUTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTEMUTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOAN WINTEMUTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTEMUTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994