THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 City Centre Drive, Ste 420
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-1444
Fax: (905) 828-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaselios Manolopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Manolopoulos (CPSO#: 68365 )
Business Address: 420B - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 608-1444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 City Centre Drive, Ste 420
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-1444
Fax: (905) 828-5136

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaselios Manolopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Manolopoulos (CPSO#: 68365 )
Business Address: 420B - 33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 608-1444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASELIOS MANOLOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VASELIOS MANOLOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994