THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:18:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6 036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5399
Fax: (416) 864-5416
Address: Toronto Heart Centre
906-2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Al-Hesayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hesayen (CPSO#: 68401 )
Business Address: Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
(647) 776-2500
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5952

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6 036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5399
Fax: (416) 864-5416
Address: Toronto Heart Centre
906-2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Al-Hesayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hesayen (CPSO#: 68401 )
Business Address: Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
(647) 776-2500
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5952

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN OMAR SULAIMAN AL-HESAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HESAYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN OMAR SULAIMAN AL-HESAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HESAYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1994