THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: (807) 684-5868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Schubert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schubert (CPSO#: 68409 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6453

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: (807) 684-5868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Schubert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schubert (CPSO#: 68409 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6453

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN SCHUBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JOHN SCHUBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHUBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1994