THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 408
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5910
Fax: (905) 529-7604
Address: ONE FERTILITY
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-4271 King St E
ONE FERTILITY KITCHENER
Kitchener ON N2P 2E9
Phone: 5196500011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-8922
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fischer (CPSO#: 68425 )
Business Address: Unit 408
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 529-5910
Business Address: 3210 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3T1
(905) 634-4440
Business Address: ISIS Regional Fertility Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
(905) 816-9822
Business Address: 200-4271 King St E
Kitchener ON N2P 2E9

Corporation Name: M.A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 408
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5910
Fax: (905) 529-7604
Address: ONE FERTILITY
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-4271 King St E
ONE FERTILITY KITCHENER
Kitchener ON N2P 2E9
Phone: 5196500011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-8922
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fischer (CPSO#: 68425 )
Business Address: Unit 408
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 529-5910
Business Address: 3210 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3T1
(905) 634-4440
Business Address: ISIS Regional Fertility Centre
2180 Meadowvale Road
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
(905) 816-9822
Business Address: 200-4271 King St E
Kitchener ON N2P 2E9

Corporation Name: M.A. Fischer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANTHONY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANTHONY FISCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1994