THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Drive
Kanata Ontario K2M 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-0805
Fax: (613) 592-0961

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert M. Yelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yelle (CPSO#: 68434 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridlewood Medical Centre
64 Stonehaven Drive
Kanata Ontario K2M 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-0805
Fax: (613) 592-0961

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert M. Yelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yelle (CPSO#: 68434 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHEL YELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHEL YELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1994