THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:54:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7475 McCowan Road
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L3S 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-9804
Fax: (416) 335-9805
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 3415
Fax: 416-431-8249
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.V. Raghubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raghubir (CPSO#: 68491 )
Business Address: 7475 McCowan Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7475 McCowan Road
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L3S 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-9804
Fax: (416) 335-9805
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 3415
Fax: 416-431-8249
Address: The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.V. Raghubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raghubir (CPSO#: 68491 )
Business Address: 7475 McCowan Rd
Markham ON L3S 3J6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUSHAL VINOD RAGHUBIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHUBIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUSHAL VINOD RAGHUBIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHUBIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1994