THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Address: Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Site
Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B5
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Extension: 1256
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajender Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 68509 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200
Business Address: Health Sciences North Sudbury - Kirkwood Site
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Pune, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-5900
Extension: 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Address: Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Site
Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B5
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Extension: 1256
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajender Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar (CPSO#: 68509 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200
Business Address: Health Sciences North Sudbury - Kirkwood Site
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-5900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJENDER KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJENDER KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1994