THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee (CPSO#: 68522 )
Business Address: 2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
9058169822 Extn: 2401
Business Address: 203 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 742-6848

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of London, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee (CPSO#: 68522 )
Business Address: 2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
9058169822 Extn: 2401
Business Address: 203 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 742-6848

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIVE CHUN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIVE CHUN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1994