THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:03:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephrology
University Health Network
8Nu-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3196
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Address: 130 Dunn Ave Dialysis Unit
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R8
Phone: 416 597 3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 03 Feb 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanita Jassal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jassal (CPSO#: 68530 )
Business Address: Divison of Nephrology
University Health Network
Room 8NU-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3196

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Nephrology
University Health Network
8Nu-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3196
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Address: 130 Dunn Ave Dialysis Unit
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R8
Phone: 416 597 3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 03 Feb 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanita Jassal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jassal (CPSO#: 68530 )
Business Address: Divison of Nephrology
University Health Network
Room 8NU-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3196

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARBJIT VANITA JASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARBJIT VANITA JASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1994