THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:11:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1400 Cameron st
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3T1
Phone: (613) 632-5656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 246 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg Manitoba R3C 0B1
Phone: 2042975344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George W. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. King (CPSO#: 68536 )
Business Address: 1400 Cameron Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3T1
(613) 632-5656
Business Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1400 Cameron st
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3T1
Phone: (613) 632-5656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 246 Portage Avenue
Winnipeg Manitoba R3C 0B1
Phone: 2042975344
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George W. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. King (CPSO#: 68536 )
Business Address: 1400 Cameron Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3T1
(613) 632-5656
Business Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE WILSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE WILSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1994