THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KASHMIRI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 150
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-7964
Fax: (519) 255-9320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil Dhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhar (CPSO#: 68596 )
Business Address: Suite 150
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 255-7864

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KASHMIRI
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 150
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-7964
Fax: (519) 255-9320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil Dhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhar (CPSO#: 68596 )
Business Address: Suite 150
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 255-7864

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL DHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL DHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kashmir University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1994
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 1994