THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:44:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjan Jariani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jariani (CPSO#: 68631 )
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite EN3-435
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjan Jariani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jariani (CPSO#: 68631 )
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite EN3-435
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN JARIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARIANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJAN JARIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARIANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1994