THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 9
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 620-9444
Fax: (519) 620-0450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret S. Moyo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moyo (CPSO#: 68651 )
Business Address: 9 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 620-9444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 9
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 620-9444
Fax: (519) 620-0450

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret S. Moyo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moyo (CPSO#: 68651 )
Business Address: 9 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 620-9444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET SIFUMA MOYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET SIFUMA MOYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1995