THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5462
Fax: (416) 864-5974
Address: 2300 Yonge Street
Suite 906
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Monge (CPSO#: 68658 )
Business Address: 4168645462

Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5462
Fax: (416) 864-5974
Address: 2300 Yonge Street
Suite 906
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Monge (CPSO#: 68658 )
Business Address: 4168645462

Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN CARLOS MONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUAN CARLOS MONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1995