THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:19:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Address: The Georgian Bay Clinic
286 King Street
Midland Ontario L4R 3M6
Phone: 7055274641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnson Bayfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bayfield (CPSO#: 68692 ) Dr. J. Johnson (CPSO#: 68706 )
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Address: 286 King St
Georgian Bay Clinic
Midland ON L4R 3M6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Address: The Georgian Bay Clinic
286 King Street
Midland Ontario L4R 3M6
Phone: 7055274641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnson Bayfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bayfield (CPSO#: 68692 ) Dr. J. Johnson (CPSO#: 68706 )
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Address: 286 King St
Georgian Bay Clinic
Midland ON L4R 3M6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN BAYFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN BAYFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1995
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 1995