THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 490 Bramalea Road
Unit 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057926500
Fax: 9057926853
Address: 305-200 Ronson Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z9
Phone: 18004840152
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 13 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan (CPSO#: 68738 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 490 Bramalea Road
Unit 204
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057926500
Fax: 9057926853
Address: 305-200 Ronson Drive
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z9
Phone: 18004840152
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 13 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vaidyanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidyanathan (CPSO#: 68738 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
05 Jan 2008
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 05 2008
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 5, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan
in accordance with an Undertaking and Consent given to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario by Dr. Vaidyanathan:

I, Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan, shall not engage in the following area(s) of
practice: surgical cosmetic procedures, including but not limited to
those specified in paragraph B of my undertaking, namely,(a) Thread Lifts
and (b) Any other surgical cosmetic procedure.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from January 5, 2008, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan
in accordance with an Undertaking and Consent given to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario by Dr. Vaidyanathan:

I, Dr. Sankar Vaidyanathan, shall not engage in the following area(s) of
practice: surgical cosmetic procedures, including but not limited to
those specified in paragraph B of my undertaking, namely,(a) Thread Lifts
and (b) Any other surgical cosmetic procedure.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 07 Jul 2006
Summary of Decision:
On July 7, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan to have committed acts of professional misconduct with respect to failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession.

On September 20, 2006, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed by the Hearings Office in conjunction with the parties no later than three months from the date this order becomes final.

2. The Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration:
(a) upon his return to practice, Dr. Vaidyanathan is restricted to performing only procedures appropriate to an office setting and, in an institutional setting, he is restricted to performing as a surgical assistant (meaning that Dr. Vaidyanathan may only assist other surgeons in their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case and is precluded from providing surgical care including any post-operative care).

(b) Dr. Vaidyanathan shall practice in an office setting under a clinical supervisor, who is acceptable to the College and who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College, for twelve months following the resumption of practice at his own expense. The clinical supervisor will report quarterly to the College. Dr. Vaidyanathan will be required to meet with the supervisor monthly, at which time the supervisor will review a representative sample of Dr. Vaidyanathan s patient charts (to be chosen by the supervisor), and discuss them with Dr. Vaidyanathan. Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to follow any recommendations of the clinical supervisor.

(c) In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan wishes to resume the full practice of obstetrics/gynecology and have the terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 removed, he must undergo a preceptorship acceptable to the College, at his own expense, for a minimum period of three months, with an obstetrician/gynecologist who is acceptable to the College, who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College. At the conclusion of the preceptorship, the preceptor must report to the College that Dr. Vaidyanathan is, in all respects, ready to resume the independent, operative practice of obstetrics/gynecology.

(d) If the parties cannot agree upon and consider it appropriate for the Committee to specify more specific terms for the preceptorship, the Committee will consider written submissions from the parties in this regard to be filed within thirty days of the date of this Order, and will impose specific terms relating to the preceptorship.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2005

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2001
Summary of Decision:
On September 8, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan guilty of professional misconduct with respect to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, falsifying a medical record, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee also found Dr. Vaidyanathan to be incompetent.

On November 8, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Vaidyanathan appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register.

2. The Registrar suspends Dr. Vaidyanathan s Certificate of Registration for a period of 24 months, beginning on the date that Dr. Vaidyanathan voluntarily agreed to completely withdraw from practice, that being August 10, 2001.


3. Eighteen months of the 24-month suspension will be suspended if, and only if, Dr. Vaidyanathan agrees, within 30 days of the release of this Decision, to comply with all of the terms and conditions set out below and to satisfy the terms and conditions on or before the 18-month period of suspension expires.

(a) Dr. Vaidyanathan is referred to the Quality Assurance Committee, which Committee will be provided with the Notice of Hearing, the Decision of the Discipline Committee, and the report of Dr. Roth. The Quality Assurance Committee will appoint a practice supervisor to monitor Dr. Vaidyanathan s office and hospital based practice, with emphasis on the practice areas enumerated in sub-paragraph 3(b) below. The supervisor will monitor Dr. Vaidyanathan s practice for a period of 6 months from the date of his return to practice or for any additional time as may be recommended by the Quality Assurance Committee. The supervisor will report his/her observations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s practice, including patient load, to the Quality Assurance Committee. The parameters, duration, and frequency of supervision and the supervisor s obligation to report to the Quality Assurance Committee will be determined by the Quality Assurance Committee.

Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the Quality Assurance Committee. The Quality Assurance Committee may also, at its discretion, conduct an independent peer review at any time.

(b) The Quality Assurance Committee will assess Dr. Vaidyanathan s competence through a Specialty Assessment Program ( S.A.P. ). Such assessment should consider and address the concerns raised in Dr. Roth s report, and focus on a general Obstetrics/Gynecology practice, with emphasis on the diagnosis and care of the following: premature ruptured membranes; premature labor; fetal distress/in-utero death; pregnancy-induced hypertension; and emergency obstetrical care and management.

The S.A.P. is to be at Dr. Vaidyanathan s cost, and may occur anytime after May 10th, 2002, but must be completed on or before March 10th, 2003. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the S.A.P. or by the Quality Assurance Committee.

Dr. Vaidyanathan must also file proof of his successful completion of the S.A.P., and his successful implementation of its recommendations, if any, with the Registrar before July 10th, 2003.

(c) Dr. Vaidyanathan will return to work gradually (i.e. he is not to assume his pre hearing caseload). Dr. Vaidyanathan must restrict his hospital practice to the hospital where he holds an active staff appointment until the end of the suspended portion of this penalty. In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan should move his active staff appointment to a different hospital, he must continue to restrict his hospital practice to one active staff appointment only during the suspended portion of the penalty. In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan does not hold an active staff appointment, he may obtain temporary privileges (locum tenens) provided he only works at no more than two hospitals at any given period of time through until the end of the suspended portion of the penalty.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will confirm his compliance with this restriction by providing the Quality Assurance Committee with written confirmation of such compliance upon his return to practice and every 4 months thereafter.

(d) Dr. Vaidyanathan will attend (at his cost, if any) and successfully complete courses acceptable to the Registrar, on Stress Management and Time Management . These courses must be completed, and Dr. Vaidyanathan must provide the Registrar with evidence of his successful completion of the courses on or before July 10, 2003.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will refer himself to a psychiatrist acceptable to the registrar within 30 days from the release of this Decision. Dr. Vaidyanathan must receive psychiatric treatment on a regular basis (at the discretion of the treating psychiatrist) for a period of at least six (6) months, or for such additional time as Dr. Vaidyanathan s psychiatrist deems necessary.

At his first appointment, Dr. Vaidyanathan shall provide the psychiatrist with a copy of the Amended Notice of Hearing, (Exhibit 1), the report of Dr. Roth (Exhibit 3), and a copy of the Discipline Committee s Decision and Reasons for Decision in this case. An undertaking from the psychiatrist, in the form attached hereto, shall be obtained and filed with the Registrar, acknowledging the psychiatrist s responsibilities.

The psychiatrist shall provide the College with a written report on Dr. Vaidyanathan s condition within six (6) months of the first appointment. The report should address whether further treatment is necessary. If treatment is continued, the psychiatrist will continue to report to the College at six (6) month intervals,.

4. Any costs relating to the implementation of this order, including costs of preparing reports, which are not covered by OHIP, shall be paid by Dr. Vaidyanathan within thirty days of Dr. Vaidyanathan s receipt of the relevant invoice.

5. In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan elects not to return to practice after the 6 month period of suspension, (i.e. if he elects not to comply with the terms and conditions in paragraph 3 above in order to suspend 18 months of the 24 month suspension) then Dr. Vaidyanathan shall immediately, and in no event later than Thursday, February 28, 2002, notify the Registrar of his decision, whereupon the Registrar shall, and is hereby directed to, impose the terms and conditions enumerated in paragraph 3 above as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall comply with those terms, conditions and limitations upon his return to practice, and they shall remain on his certificate of registration until satisfied.

6. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $12,500 within a period of eight (8) months following the day that Dr. Vaidyanathan returns to practice or within twelve (12) months from the day following the last day of the license suspension, whichever first occurs.

7. In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan breaches or fails to fulfill any one of the foregoing conditions, his certificate of registration shall immediately be suspended until such time as the conditions are fulfilled.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2001-12-15
Hearing Date(s): Aug 15, 2001

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (2)

Date of Decision: 07 Jul 2006
Summary of Decision:
On July 7, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan to have committed acts of professional misconduct with respect to failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession.

On September 20, 2006, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed by the Hearings Office in conjunction with the parties no later than three months from the date this order becomes final.

2. The Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration:
(a) upon his return to practice, Dr. Vaidyanathan is restricted to performing only procedures appropriate to an office setting and, in an institutional setting, he is restricted to performing as a surgical assistant (meaning that Dr. Vaidyanathan may only assist other surgeons in their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case and is precluded from providing surgical care including any post-operative care).

(b) Dr. Vaidyanathan shall practice in an office setting under a clinical supervisor, who is acceptable to the College and who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College, for twelve months following the resumption of practice at his own expense. The clinical supervisor will report quarterly to the College. Dr. Vaidyanathan will be required to meet with the supervisor monthly, at which time the supervisor will review a representative sample of Dr. Vaidyanathan s patient charts (to be chosen by the supervisor), and discuss them with Dr. Vaidyanathan. Dr. Vaidyanathan is required to follow any recommendations of the clinical supervisor.

(c) In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan wishes to resume the full practice of obstetrics/gynecology and have the terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 removed, he must undergo a preceptorship acceptable to the College, at his own expense, for a minimum period of three months, with an obstetrician/gynecologist who is acceptable to the College, who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College. At the conclusion of the preceptorship, the preceptor must report to the College that Dr. Vaidyanathan is, in all respects, ready to resume the independent, operative practice of obstetrics/gynecology.

(d) If the parties cannot agree upon and consider it appropriate for the Committee to specify more specific terms for the preceptorship, the Committee will consider written submissions from the parties in this regard to be filed within thirty days of the date of this Order, and will impose specific terms relating to the preceptorship.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 2005

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2001
Summary of Decision:
On September 8, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vaidyanathan guilty of professional misconduct with respect to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, falsifying a medical record, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee also found Dr. Vaidyanathan to be incompetent.

On November 8, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1. Dr. Vaidyanathan appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register.

2. The Registrar suspends Dr. Vaidyanathan s Certificate of Registration for a period of 24 months, beginning on the date that Dr. Vaidyanathan voluntarily agreed to completely withdraw from practice, that being August 10, 2001.


3. Eighteen months of the 24-month suspension will be suspended if, and only if, Dr. Vaidyanathan agrees, within 30 days of the release of this Decision, to comply with all of the terms and conditions set out below and to satisfy the terms and conditions on or before the 18-month period of suspension expires.

(a) Dr. Vaidyanathan is referred to the Quality Assurance Committee, which Committee will be provided with the Notice of Hearing, the Decision of the Discipline Committee, and the report of Dr. Roth. The Quality Assurance Committee will appoint a practice supervisor to monitor Dr. Vaidyanathan s office and hospital based practice, with emphasis on the practice areas enumerated in sub-paragraph 3(b) below. The supervisor will monitor Dr. Vaidyanathan s practice for a period of 6 months from the date of his return to practice or for any additional time as may be recommended by the Quality Assurance Committee. The supervisor will report his/her observations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s practice, including patient load, to the Quality Assurance Committee. The parameters, duration, and frequency of supervision and the supervisor s obligation to report to the Quality Assurance Committee will be determined by the Quality Assurance Committee.

Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the Quality Assurance Committee. The Quality Assurance Committee may also, at its discretion, conduct an independent peer review at any time.

(b) The Quality Assurance Committee will assess Dr. Vaidyanathan s competence through a Specialty Assessment Program ( S.A.P. ). Such assessment should consider and address the concerns raised in Dr. Roth s report, and focus on a general Obstetrics/Gynecology practice, with emphasis on the diagnosis and care of the following: premature ruptured membranes; premature labor; fetal distress/in-utero death; pregnancy-induced hypertension; and emergency obstetrical care and management.

The S.A.P. is to be at Dr. Vaidyanathan s cost, and may occur anytime after May 10th, 2002, but must be completed on or before March 10th, 2003. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall abide by, and implement forthwith, any recommendations made by the S.A.P. or by the Quality Assurance Committee.

Dr. Vaidyanathan must also file proof of his successful completion of the S.A.P., and his successful implementation of its recommendations, if any, with the Registrar before July 10th, 2003.

(c) Dr. Vaidyanathan will return to work gradually (i.e. he is not to assume his pre hearing caseload). Dr. Vaidyanathan must restrict his hospital practice to the hospital where he holds an active staff appointment until the end of the suspended portion of this penalty. In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan should move his active staff appointment to a different hospital, he must continue to restrict his hospital practice to one active staff appointment only during the suspended portion of the penalty. In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan does not hold an active staff appointment, he may obtain temporary privileges (locum tenens) provided he only works at no more than two hospitals at any given period of time through until the end of the suspended portion of the penalty.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will confirm his compliance with this restriction by providing the Quality Assurance Committee with written confirmation of such compliance upon his return to practice and every 4 months thereafter.

(d) Dr. Vaidyanathan will attend (at his cost, if any) and successfully complete courses acceptable to the Registrar, on Stress Management and Time Management . These courses must be completed, and Dr. Vaidyanathan must provide the Registrar with evidence of his successful completion of the courses on or before July 10, 2003.

Dr. Vaidyanathan will refer himself to a psychiatrist acceptable to the registrar within 30 days from the release of this Decision. Dr. Vaidyanathan must receive psychiatric treatment on a regular basis (at the discretion of the treating psychiatrist) for a period of at least six (6) months, or for such additional time as Dr. Vaidyanathan s psychiatrist deems necessary.

At his first appointment, Dr. Vaidyanathan shall provide the psychiatrist with a copy of the Amended Notice of Hearing, (Exhibit 1), the report of Dr. Roth (Exhibit 3), and a copy of the Discipline Committee s Decision and Reasons for Decision in this case. An undertaking from the psychiatrist, in the form attached hereto, shall be obtained and filed with the Registrar, acknowledging the psychiatrist s responsibilities.

The psychiatrist shall provide the College with a written report on Dr. Vaidyanathan s condition within six (6) months of the first appointment. The report should address whether further treatment is necessary. If treatment is continued, the psychiatrist will continue to report to the College at six (6) month intervals,.

4. Any costs relating to the implementation of this order, including costs of preparing reports, which are not covered by OHIP, shall be paid by Dr. Vaidyanathan within thirty days of Dr. Vaidyanathan s receipt of the relevant invoice.

5. In the event Dr. Vaidyanathan elects not to return to practice after the 6 month period of suspension, (i.e. if he elects not to comply with the terms and conditions in paragraph 3 above in order to suspend 18 months of the 24 month suspension) then Dr. Vaidyanathan shall immediately, and in no event later than Thursday, February 28, 2002, notify the Registrar of his decision, whereupon the Registrar shall, and is hereby directed to, impose the terms and conditions enumerated in paragraph 3 above as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Vaidyanathan s certificate of registration. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall comply with those terms, conditions and limitations upon his return to practice, and they shall remain on his certificate of registration until satisfied.

6. Dr. Vaidyanathan shall pay to the College costs in the amount of $12,500 within a period of eight (8) months following the day that Dr. Vaidyanathan returns to practice or within twelve (12) months from the day following the last day of the license suspension, whichever first occurs.

7. In the event that Dr. Vaidyanathan breaches or fails to fulfill any one of the foregoing conditions, his certificate of registration shall immediately be suspended until such time as the conditions are fulfilled.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2001-12-15
Hearing Date(s): Aug 15, 2001

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 25 Feb 2005
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 10 Feb 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Aug 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2002

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2001

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995