THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:28:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 111-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164909348
Fax: 4164924464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All inquiries from patients and/or third parties for patient records must be directed to
Access Information Management of Canada
by phone at 1-877-345-3546 or through email at [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Kurup Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kurup (CPSO#: 68740 )
Business Address: 111-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
4164909348

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 111-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164909348
Fax: 4164924464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All inquiries from patients and/or third parties for patient records must be directed to
Access Information Management of Canada
by phone at 1-877-345-3546 or through email at [email protected]
Date Received: 21 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Kurup Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kurup (CPSO#: 68740 )
Business Address: 111-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
4164909348

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHA KURUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHA KURUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995