THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Gezira, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Finch Ave West
Suite 518
Toronto ONTARIO M3J 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-1016
Fax: 416-782-1742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex W Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iskander (CPSO#: 68744 )
Business Address: 58 Cassandra Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4B 4A1

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex W. Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Gezira, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Finch Ave West
Suite 518
Toronto ONTARIO M3J 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-782-1016
Fax: 416-782-1742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex W Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iskander (CPSO#: 68744 )
Business Address: 58 Cassandra Cres
Richmond Hill ON L4B 4A1

Corporation Name: Dr. Alex W. Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WILSON ISKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKANDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WILSON ISKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKANDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Gezira, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995