THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:16:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 725 0885
Fax: 705 725 9498
Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie, Ontario
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: 705 792 0933
Fax: 705 792 0966
Address: 6 McPherson Street
HHHS
Minden Ontario K0M 2K0
Phone: (705) 286-2288
Fax: 705 2864723

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Howard (CPSO#: 68752 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Royal Victoria Hospital
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-0885
Business Address: 6 McPherson Street
Haliburton Ontario K0M 2K0
(705) 286-2288
Business Address: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 725 0885
Fax: 705 725 9498
Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie, Ontario
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: 705 792 0933
Fax: 705 792 0966
Address: 6 McPherson Street
HHHS
Minden Ontario K0M 2K0
Phone: (705) 286-2288
Fax: 705 2864723

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Howard (CPSO#: 68752 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Royal Victoria Hospital
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 725-0885
Business Address: 6 McPherson Street
Haliburton Ontario K0M 2K0
(705) 286-2288
Business Address: 106-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LEROY HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LEROY HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995