THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Walkerville Medical Centre
2224 Walker Road
Suite 200
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0162
Fax: (519) 252-7223
Address: 3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Phone: 905-388-9505
Fax: 905-632-9778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Y. Emara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Emara (CPSO#: 68758 )
Business Address: South Walkerville Medical Centre
200 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 258-0162

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Walkerville Medical Centre
2224 Walker Road
Suite 200
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0162
Fax: (519) 252-7223
Address: 3305 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N2
Phone: 905-388-9505
Fax: 905-632-9778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Y. Emara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Emara (CPSO#: 68758 )
Business Address: South Walkerville Medical Centre
200 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 258-0162

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY YEHIA EMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY YEHIA EMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995