THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanmer Shopping Center
Unit 23
5085 Highway 69 North
Hanmer Ontario P3P 1P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 969-0628
Fax: (705) 969-0629
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705522-0220
Fax: 705675-4794
Address: Northwood Medical Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 566-2227
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desmarais (CPSO#: 68759 )
Business Address: Hanmer Shopping Center
5085 Highway 69 North
Box 23
Hanmer Ontario P3P 1P7
(705) 969-0627
Business Address: 1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P2A 1Y8

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanmer Shopping Center
Unit 23
5085 Highway 69 North
Hanmer Ontario P3P 1P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 969-0628
Fax: (705) 969-0629
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705522-0220
Fax: 705675-4794
Address: Northwood Medical Clinic
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 566-2227
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desmarais (CPSO#: 68759 )
Business Address: Hanmer Shopping Center
5085 Highway 69 North
Box 23
Hanmer Ontario P3P 1P7
(705) 969-0627
Business Address: 1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P2A 1Y8

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Desmarais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DESMARAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESMARAIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DESMARAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESMARAIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995