THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 228
284 Queen St. East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 866-6462
Fax: (647) 361-8608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priya Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chopra (CPSO#: 68760 )
Business Address: 223-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
9058666462
Business Address: Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 866-6462
Business Address: 228-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 228
284 Queen St. East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 866-6462
Fax: (647) 361-8608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Priya Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chopra (CPSO#: 68760 )
Business Address: 223-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
9058666462
Business Address: Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W3
(905) 866-6462
Business Address: 228-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995