THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Clappison Avenue
Unit 1
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: 905-689-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Xenoyannis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xenoyannis (CPSO#: 68771 )
Business Address: Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
PO Box 311
Carlisle Ontario L0R 1H0
(905) 689-3301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Clappison Avenue
Unit 1
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: 905-689-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Xenoyannis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xenoyannis (CPSO#: 68771 )
Business Address: Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
PO Box 311
Carlisle Ontario L0R 1H0
(905) 689-3301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA XENOYANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XENOYANNIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA XENOYANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XENOYANNIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995