THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:11:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Associates
Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Weatherdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weatherdon (CPSO#: 68772 )
Business Address: Medical Associates
100 - 155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Associates
Suite 100
155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Fax: (905) 945-7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Weatherdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Weatherdon (CPSO#: 68772 )
Business Address: Medical Associates
100 - 155 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK SCOTT WEATHERDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEATHERDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK SCOTT WEATHERDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEATHERDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995