THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:03:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10b Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-783-0022
Fax: 519-783-0032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc.
Date Received: 09 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NICHOLAS AND LISA MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McFarlane (CPSO#: 68777 ) Dr. N. McFarlane (CPSO#: 68745 )
Business Address: Suite 202
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
(519) 954-2370
Business Address: 269 Carrington Place
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2K1
5195749914

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10b Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-783-0022
Fax: 519-783-0032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc.
Date Received: 09 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NICHOLAS AND LISA MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McFarlane (CPSO#: 68777 ) Dr. N. McFarlane (CPSO#: 68745 )
Business Address: Suite 202
148 Manitou Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2C 1L3
(519) 954-2370
Business Address: 269 Carrington Place
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2K1
5195749914

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANNE MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANNE MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995