THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8133
Fax: (519) 646-6355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheidow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sheidow (CPSO#: 68778 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8133

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8133
Fax: (519) 646-6355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheidow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sheidow (CPSO#: 68778 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8133

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON SHEIDOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIDOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON SHEIDOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIDOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995