THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
13126 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 956-8867
Fax: (519) 956-8317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. M. Penava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Penava (CPSO#: 68782 )
Business Address: Suite 1
13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 956-8867

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CROATIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
13126 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 956-8867
Fax: (519) 956-8317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. M. Penava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Penava (CPSO#: 68782 )
Business Address: Suite 1
13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 956-8867

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE PENAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENAVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE PENAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENAVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995