THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 2631
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6428
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Critical Care
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-8770.
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Needham-Nethercott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Needham-Nethercott (CPSO#: 68785 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 2631
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6428
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay St
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Critical Care
Pembroke ON K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-8770.
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Needham-Nethercott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Needham-Nethercott (CPSO#: 68785 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEDHAM-NETHERCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995