THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 - 1 Frankford Cres
Trenton ON K8V 6H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 965-5777
Fax: (613) 965-4253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Lachapelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lachapelle (CPSO#: 68787 )
Business Address: 2-1 Frankford Cres
Trenton ON K8V 6H8
6139655777

Corporation Name: Kevin Lachapelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 - 1 Frankford Cres
Trenton ON K8V 6H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 965-5777
Fax: (613) 965-4253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Lachapelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lachapelle (CPSO#: 68787 )
Business Address: 2-1 Frankford Cres
Trenton ON K8V 6H8
6139655777

Corporation Name: Kevin Lachapelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT LACHAPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHAPELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT LACHAPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHAPELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995