THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:23:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7R 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-4116
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 38510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Corpn
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joe Cherian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cherian (CPSO#: 68790 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 38510
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lake Shore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 336-4116

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7R 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-4116
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 38510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Corpn
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joe Cherian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cherian (CPSO#: 68790 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 38510
Business Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lake Shore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 336-4116

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOE CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOE CHERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995