THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manila Central University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7131 Bathurst Street
Unit 201
Vaughan Ontario L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647.499.8289
Fax: 905.532.3630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vilma Tan-Jarvis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tan-Jarvis (CPSO#: 68794 )
Business Address: Unit 170
10 Disera Drive
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
(905) 763-6333
Business Address: 7131 Bathurst Street
201
Vaughan Ontario L4J 7Z1
6474998289

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG
Medical School: Manila Central University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7131 Bathurst Street
Unit 201
Vaughan Ontario L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647.499.8289
Fax: 905.532.3630

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vilma Tan-Jarvis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tan-Jarvis (CPSO#: 68794 )
Business Address: Unit 170
10 Disera Drive
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
(905) 763-6333
Business Address: 7131 Bathurst Street
201
Vaughan Ontario L4J 7Z1
6474998289

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VILMA SARANGELO TAN-JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN-JARVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VILMA SARANGELO TAN-JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN-JARVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manila Central University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995