THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKillop Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davis (CPSO#: 71081 ) Dr. G. McKillop (CPSO#: 68802 )
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2567
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
Department of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKillop Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davis (CPSO#: 71081 ) Dr. G. McKillop (CPSO#: 68802 )
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2567
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital
Department of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME JOHN MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME JOHN MCKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKILLOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995