THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
164 Queen St East
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6V1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-0185
Fax: (905) 451-4743
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
Unit #28
WELL Health diagnostic centre
Brampton Ontario L6S 2M3
Phone: 18339044575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jeejeebhoy (CPSO#: 68804 )

Corporation Name: Farida Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jeejeebhoy (CPSO#: 68804 )
Business Address: 209-164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L8V 1B4
(905) 451-0185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
164 Queen St East
Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6V1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-0185
Fax: (905) 451-4743
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
Unit #28
WELL Health diagnostic centre
Brampton Ontario L6S 2M3
Phone: 18339044575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jeejeebhoy (CPSO#: 68804 )

Corporation Name: Farida Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jeejeebhoy (CPSO#: 68804 )
Business Address: 209-164 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L8V 1B4
(905) 451-0185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIDA MARY JEEJEEBHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEJEEBHOY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARIDA MARY JEEJEEBHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEJEEBHOY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995