THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cognitive Neurology Rm A2 - 127
Parkwood Institute Main Building
St. Joseph's Health Care London
550 Wellington
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 646-6032
Fax: 519 646-6226

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Pasternak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer (CPSO#: 67165 ) Dr. S. Pasternak (CPSO#: 68821 )
Business Address: Cognitive Neurology and Alzheimer's Research Centr
Parkwood Hospital
Main Building Room A2-127
550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 0A7
(519) 646-6032

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Hirscheimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer (CPSO#: 67165 ) Dr. S. Pasternak (CPSO#: 68821 )
Business Address: 304 - 450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 204-8650

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cognitive Neurology Rm A2 - 127
Parkwood Institute Main Building
St. Joseph's Health Care London
550 Wellington
London Ontario N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 646-6032
Fax: 519 646-6226

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Pasternak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer (CPSO#: 67165 ) Dr. S. Pasternak (CPSO#: 68821 )
Business Address: Cognitive Neurology and Alzheimer's Research Centr
Parkwood Hospital
Main Building Room A2-127
550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6C 0A7
(519) 646-6032

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Hirscheimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirscheimer (CPSO#: 67165 ) Dr. S. Pasternak (CPSO#: 68821 )
Business Address: 304 - 450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 204-8650

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD PASTERNAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTERNAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HOWARD PASTERNAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTERNAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995