THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8726
Fax: (519) 685-8109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sameer Elsayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elsayed (CPSO#: 68843 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 183 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6207
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 421-4211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8726
Fax: (519) 685-8109

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sameer Elsayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elsayed (CPSO#: 68843 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 183 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2030
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6207
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 421-4211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER ELSAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSAYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMEER ELSAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSAYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995