THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-3011
Fax: 416-221-3097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Dwosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dwosh (CPSO#: 68844 )
Business Address: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
416-222-3011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-3011
Fax: 416-221-3097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Dwosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dwosh (CPSO#: 68844 )
Business Address: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
416-222-3011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM AKIVA DWOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWOSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM AKIVA DWOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWOSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995