THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:51:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Extension: 6485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.S.G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martin (CPSO#: 68855 )
Business Address: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
(519) 744-7361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Extension: 6485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.S.G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martin (CPSO#: 68855 )
Business Address: 835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
(519) 744-7361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD STIRLING GIBSON MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD STIRLING GIBSON MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995